Docket for 17-5808 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 08 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 29, 2017) | | | Sep 28 2017 | Brief of respondent Charlotte Jenkins, Warden in opposition filed. | | | Oct 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | | Nov 20 2017 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | | Jan 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Rehearing DENIED. | | |
|