Docket for 17-5669 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 15 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 20, 2017) | | | Sep 17 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 20, 2017. | | | Sep 25 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Louis Gaskin filed. | | | Oct 16 2017 | Second supplemental brief of petitioner Louis Gaskin filed. | | | Oct 19 2017 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Reply of petitioner Louis Gaskin filed. | | | Nov 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017. | | | Nov 27 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|