Docket for 17-5663 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 17 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 21, 2017) | | | Sep 21 2017 | Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. | | | Oct 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|