Docket for 17-5626 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 31 2017 | Application (16A1195) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2017 to August 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | | Jun 02 2017 | Application (16A1195) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 12, 2017. | | | Aug 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 18, 2017) | | | Sep 14 2017 | Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. | | | Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Sep 28 2017 | Reply of petitioner Keith LaMar filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|