Docket for 17-5598 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 16 2017 | Application (16A1167) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2017 to August 4, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | May 31 2017 | Application (16A1167) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 4, 2017. | | | Aug 04 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 14, 2017) | | | Sep 14 2017 | Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed. | | | Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Sep 28 2017 | Reply of petitioner Steven Vernon Bixby filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|