Docket for 17-5575 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 26 2017 | Application (16A1049) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2017 to August 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | May 02 2017 | Application (16A1049) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 13, 2017. | | | Aug 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 13, 2017) | | | Sep 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Reply of petitioner Tavares J. Wright filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 16 2017 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Moore v. Texas, 581 U. S. ____ (2017). | | | Nov 20 2017 | MANDATE ISSUED. | | | Nov 20 2017 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|