Docket for 17-535
|
Oct 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017) | | | Nov 02 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017. | | | Dec 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Joseph Matal, Interim Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office filed. | | Certificate of Word CountMain Document | Dec 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Apr 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. | | | Apr 30 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|