Docket for 17-5287 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 21, 2017) | | | Aug 21 2017 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | | Sep 07 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Sep 07 2017 | Reply of petitioner Ruben Becerrada filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|