Docket for 17-5197 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 13 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 16, 2017) | | | Aug 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2017. | | | Sep 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Davis, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Reply of petitioner Troy Clark filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|