Docket for 17-5127 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 04 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 10, 2017) | | | Jul 31 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 24, 2017. | | | Aug 23 2017 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | | Sep 06 2017 | Reply of petitioner Robert L.Pruett filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 07 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|