Docket for 17-5125 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 24 2017 | Application (16A1050) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 2, 2017 to July 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | May 04 2017 | Application (16A1050) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 1, 2017. | | | Jul 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 10, 2017) | | | Aug 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2017. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | | Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|