Docket for 17-5017 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 27, 2017) | | | Jul 25 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 28, 2017. | | | Aug 24 2017 | Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. | | | Sep 07 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|