Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-49
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-49
Title:Roger C. S. Lin, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5149)
   Decision Date:March 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017)
Jul 24 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jul 31 2017Waiver of right of respondent Republic of China (Taiwan) to respond filed.
Aug 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Charles H. Camp
    Counsel of Record
600 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Suite 640
Washington, DC 20037

ccamp@charlescamplaw.com
(202)-457-7786
Party name: Roger C. S. Lin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Thomas Gardiner Corcoran Jr.Berliner Corcoran & Rowe, LLP
1101 17th Street, NW
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036-4798

tgc@bcr-dc.com
(202) 293-1132
Party name: Republic of China (Taiwan)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543