Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-479
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-479
Title:Reece N. Tso, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 2, 2017
Linked with 17A40
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0497/MC)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2017Application (17A40) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 06 2017Application (17A40) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 29, 2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2017)
Oct 27 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 1, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 1, 2017 to December 6, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 20 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2017.
Dec 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rey Andrew Austria
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris St., SE,
Bldg. 58, Suite 100
Washington Navy Yard, DC 20374-5124

rey.austria@navy.mil
(202) 685-7054
Party name: Reece N. Tso
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543