Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-446
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-446
Vide 17-418
Title:Riverkeeper, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:September 25, 2017
Linked with 17A65
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1823, 14-1909, 14-1991, 14-1997, 14-2003)
   Decision Date:January 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 18, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2017Application (17A65) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 17, 2017 to September 15, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jul 14 2017Application (17A65) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 15, 2017.
Sep 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2017)
Oct 19 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 24, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 19, 2018, for all respondents.
Jan 19 2018Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 19 2018Waiver of right of respondent City of New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2018Brief of Intervenor-Respondents Western States and Western Water Providers in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2018Reply of petitioners Riverkeepers, Inc., et al., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Karl Stephen Coplan
    Counsel of Record
Pace Environmental Litigation Clinic, Inc.
78 North Broadway
White Plains, NY 10603

kcoplan@law.pace.edu
(914) 422-4343
Party name: Riverkeepers, Inc., et al., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jennifer Dawn Brown
    Counsel of Record
Agency - South Florida Water Management District
3301 Gun Club Road
MSC 1410
West Palm Beach, FL 33406

jebrown@sfwmd.gov
561-682-2258
Party name: South Florida Water Management District
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Devin Andrew Slack
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

dslack@law.nyc.gov
212-356-0817
Party name: City of New York
Other
Frederick Richard Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Department of Law
Solicitor General
1300 Broadway, 9th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
720-508-6000
Party name: Western States and Western Water Providers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543