Docket for 17-424
|
Sep 15 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2017) | | | Oct 19 2017 | Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed. | | | Oct 20 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Professors of Constitutional and Family Law filed. | | | Oct 20 2017 | Brief of respondents Jack Pidgeon, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Oct 20 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Mark Phariss & Victor Holmes filed. | | | Oct 20 2017 | Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al. filed. | | | Oct 20 2017 | Brief amici curiae of LGBT Bar Association and Equality Texas filed. | | | Nov 06 2017 | Reply of petitioners Turner, Mayor, et al. filed. | | | Nov 08 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|