Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-368
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-368
Title:Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District, Petitioner
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., fka SolarCity Corporation
Docketed:September 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17302)
   Decision Date:June 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2017)
Oct 11 2017Brief of respondent SolarCity Corporation in opposition filed.
Oct 11 2017Brief amici curiae of American Public Power Association, et al. filed.
Oct 31 2017Reply of petitioner Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 01 2017Petition GRANTED.
Dec 07 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Salt River Project Agricultural District
Blanket Consent
Jan 13 2018Brief of petitioner Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Brief amici curiae of National Governors Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Brief amici curiae of American Public Power Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Tennessee, Arizona Arkansas Colorado Georgia Idaho Indiana Louisiana Kansas Mississippi Missouri Montana Nebraska New Hampshire Ohio Rhode Island South Carolina South Dakota Texas Utah Vermont West Virginia Wisconsin Wyoming filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 19, 2018
Feb 07 2018CIRCULATED
Feb 12 2018Letter of respondent Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., fka SolarCity Corporation filed.
Main Document
Feb 12 2018Brief of respondent Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2018Amicus brief of Center for Biological Diversity, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Amicus brief of Public Citizen, Inc. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Amicus brief of American Antitrust Institute submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2018Motion of United States of America for leave to participate in oral argument and for divided argument submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 21 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Molly S. Boast
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Molly.Boast@wilmerhale.com
212 230 8800
Party name: Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District
Attorneys for Respondent
Deanne E. Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Suite 6000
Washington, DC 20006

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.
Richard A. FeinsteinBoies Schiller Flexner, LLP
1401 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

rfeinstein@bsfllp.com
202-237-6131
Party name: Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.
Other
John Michael Baker
    Counsel of Record
Greene Espel, PLLP
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 2200
Minneapolis, MN 55402

jbaker@greeneespel.com
(612) 373-0830
Party name: American Public Power Association, et al.
Andree Kahn Blumstein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

andree.blumstein@ag.tn.gov
615-741-3492
Party name: States of Tennessee, Arizona Arkansas Colorado Georgia Idaho Indiana Louisiana Kansas Mississippi Missouri Montana Nebraska New Hampshire Ohio Rhode Island South Carolina South Dakota Texas Utah Vermont West Virginia Wisconsin Wyoming
Jarod Michael Bona
    Counsel of Record
Bona Law PC
4275 Executive Square
Suite 200
La Jolla, CA 92037

jarod.bona@bonalawpc.com
8589644589
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
Richard M. Brunell
    Counsel of Record
American Antitrust Institute
1025 Connecticut Ave.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

rbrunell@antitrustinstitute.org
2026009640
Party name: American Antitrust Institute
Howard M. Crystal
    Counsel of Record
Center for Biological Diversity
1411 K Street NW
Suite 1300
Washington, DC 20005

hcrystal@biologicaldiversity.org
202-809-6926
Party name: Center for Biological Diversity, et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Tillman Lowry Lay
    Counsel of Record
Spiegel & McDiarmid, LLP
1875 Eye Street NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

tim.lay@spiegelmcd.com
202-879-4000
Party name: National Governors Association, et al.
Sean Michael Sherman
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

ssherman@citizen.org
2025881000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543