Aug 29 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2017) |
| |
Sep 19 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017, for all respondents. |
| |
Sep 28 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Senator Jeff Flake, et al. filed. |
| |
Sep 28 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of California State Sheriffs' Association filed. |
| |
Nov 13 2017 | Brief of respondents Moises Patricio-Guzman, et al. in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentOtherProof of Service |
Nov 13 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Moises Patricio-Guzman |
| Main Document |
Nov 13 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Rene Sanchez-Gomez |
| Main Document |
Nov 13 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Jasmin Isabel Morales |
| Main Document |
Nov 13 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Mark William Ring |
| Main Document |
Nov 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017. |
| |
Nov 21 2017 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Dec 08 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondents GRANTED. |
| |
Dec 08 2017 | Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. |
| |
Jan 22 2018 | Brief of petitioner United States filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jan 22 2018 | Joint appendix filed. |
| Proof of ServiceMain Document |
Jan 24 2018 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 26, 2018 |
| |
Feb 07 2018 | CIRCULATED |
| |
Feb 21 2018 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. |
| |
Feb 21 2018 | Brief of respondents Moises Patricio-Guzman, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 28 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Former Judges, Former Prosecutors, Former Government Officials, Law Professors, and Social Scientists filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 28 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 14 2018 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 23 2018 | Motion for appointment of counsel filed by respondent Rene Sanchez-Gomez. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 26 2018 | Argued. For petitioner: Allon Kedem, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Reuben C. Cahn, San Diego, Cal. |
| |
Apr 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018. |
| |
Apr 30 2018 | Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent GRANTED, and Ellis M. Johnston, III, Esquire, of San Diego, California, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent Rene Sanchez-Gomez in this case. |
| |
May 14 2018 | Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. |
| |
Jun 15 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |