Docket for 17-291 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 06 2017 | Application (17A50) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 18, 2017 to August 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | | Jul 10 2017 | Application (17A50) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 17, 2017. | | | Aug 17 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2017) | | | Sep 14 2017 | Brief of respondent Andrew Lee Thomas, Jr. in opposition filed. | | | Sep 14 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andrew Lee Thomas, Jr. | | | Oct 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|