Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-2
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-2
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Microsoft Corporation
Docketed:June 27, 2017
Linked with 16A972
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2985)
   Decision Date:July 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2017Application (16A972) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2017 to May 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Apr 12 2017Application (16A972) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 24, 2017.
May 12 2017Application (16A972) to extend further the time from May 24, 2017 to June 23, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
May 15 2017Application (16A972) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 23, 2017.
Jun 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 28, 2017.
Jul 27 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Vermont, et al. filed.
Aug 28 2017Brief of respondent Microsoft Corporation in opposition filed.
Sep 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 13 2017Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Sep 15 2017Supplemental brief of respondent Microsoft Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition GRANTED.
Nov 01 2017The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 11, 2018.
Nov 01 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 6, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, United States
Nov 09 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent, Microsoft Corporation.
Dec 06 2017Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 06 2017Joint appendix filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Former Law Enforcement, National Security, and Intelligence Officials in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of European Commission on Behalf of the European Union in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of The New Zealand Privacy Commissioner in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2017Brief amici curiae of Electronic Discovery Institute, et al., in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Vermont, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Ireland in support of neither party filed.
Proof of ServiceMain DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of U.N. Special Rapporteur on the Right to Privacy Joseph Cannataci in support of neither partyfiled.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, February 27, 2018
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Jan 11 2018Brief amici curiae of Bundesverband der Deutschen Industrie e.V., Deutscher Industrie- und Handelskammertag e.V., Ibec clg, Konfederacja Lewiatan, and Mouvement des Enterprises de France filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 11 2018Brief of respondent Microsoft Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of 1 envelope of Sealed Documents.
Jan 17 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit is electronic.
Jan 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of 51 Computer Scientists filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute, Cato Institute, Reason Foundation, TechFreedom, American Consumer Institute Center for Citizen Research filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Council of Bars and Law Societies of Europe filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of International and Extraterritorial Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of 12 Business and Consumer Associations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of EU Data Protection and Privacy Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Policing Project at New York University School of Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Technology Companies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Jan Philipp Albrecht, Sophie in ’t Veld, Viviane Reding, Birgit Sippel, and Axel Voss filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of DIGITALEUROPE, BITKOM, TECH IN France, Syntec Numerique, and Other European National Trade Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Business Machines Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Privacy International, Human and Digital Rights Organizations, and International Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of European Company Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Fourth Amendment Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of InternetLab Law and Technology Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amici curiae of Digital Rights Ireland Limited and the Open Rights Group filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Gesellschaft fur Freiheitsrechte e.V. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 27 2018Argued. For petitioner: Michael R. Dreeben, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: E. Joshua Rosenkranz, New York, N. Y.
Mar 23 2018Letter of petitioner United States advising the Court of newly enacted legislation filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 30 2018Motion to vacate the judgment of the Court of Appeals and remand the case with directions to dismiss as moot filed by petitioner United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 03 2018Response to motion to vacate the judgment of the Court of Appeals and remand the case with directions to dismiss as moot from respondent Microsoft Corporation filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 17 2018Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Opinion per curiam.
May 21 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.
Aug 29 2018The record from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of New York has been returned.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212)-506-5000
Party name: Microsoft Corporation
Other
Donald I Baker
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Miller PLLC
2401 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20037

dbaker@bakerandmiller.com
202-663-7820
Party name: Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland
Nowell David Beckett Bamberger
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

nbamberger@cgsh.com
2029741752
Party name: Council of Bars and Law Societies of Europe
Benjamin Daniel Battles
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
109 State Street
Montpelier, VT 05609

benjamin.battles@vermont.gov
(802) 828-5500
Party name: The States of Vermont, et al.
Michael Evan Bern
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

michael.bern@lw.com
202-637-1021
Party name: Members of Congress
Jonathan I. Blackman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006-0000

jblackman@cgsh.com
212-225-2490
Party name: European Company Lawyers Association
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
1156 15th St NW
Suite 1250
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
(202) 795-9300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, et al.
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: International and Extraterritorial Law Scholars
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
301-857-1005
Party name: Policing Project at New York University School of Law
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: International Business Machines Corporation
Gus P. Coldebella
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson P.C.
One Marina Park Drive
Boston, MA 02210

coldebella@fr.com
617-542-5070
Party name: Former Law Enforcement, National Security, and Intelligence Officials
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19109

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-6563300
Party name: Digitaleurope, Bitkom, Tech In France, Syntech Numérique, and Other European National Trade Organizations
Thomas Jude Goodwin
    Counsel of Record
McCarter & English, LLP
Four Gateway Center
100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102

tgoodwin@mccarter.com
973-622-4444
Party name: Ireland
Saad Gul
    Counsel of Record
Poyner Spruill LLP
301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1900
Raleigh, NC 27601

sgul@poynerspruill.com
9197831170
Party name: Bundesverband der Deutschen Industrie e.V., Deutscher Industrie- und Handelskammertag e.V., Ibec clg, Konfederacja Lewiatan, and Mouvement des Enterprises de France
James W. Harper
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L St., NW, 7th Fl.
Washington, DC 20005

jimharperdc@earthlink.net
202-331-1010
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute, Cato Institute, Reason Foundation, TechFreedom, American Consumer Institute Center for Citizen Research
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: The New Zealand Privacy Commissioner
David Jason Kessler
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
1031 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6022

david.kessler@nortonrosefulbright.com
212-318-3382
Party name: Electronic Discovery Institute, et al.
Vivek Krishnamurthy
    Counsel of Record
Wasserstein Hall, Suite 5018
1585 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

vkrishnamurthy@law.harvard.edu
617-384-9125
Party name: U.N. Special Rapporteur on the Right to Privacy Joseph Cannataci
Amy Lynn Neuhardt
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20015

aneuhardt@bsfllp.com
2022372727
Party name: InternetLab Law and Technology Center
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020-1095

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8891
Party name: Jan Philipp Albrecht, Sophie in ’t Veld, Viviane Reding, Birgit Sippel, and Axel Voss
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8200
Party name: Digital Rights Ireland Limited and the Open Rights Group
Owen C. Pell
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

opell@whitecase.com
212-819-8200
Party name: Gesellschaft Fur Freiheitsrechte e.V.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: 12 Business and Consumer Associations
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Daniel Martin Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10024

dsullivan@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: EU Data Protection and Privacy Scholars
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: European Commission
John D. Vandenberg Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Klarquist Sparkman, LLP
121 S.W. Salmon Street
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

john.vandenberg@klarquist.com
503-595-5300
Party name: 51 Computer Scientists
Michael A. Vatis
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mvatis@steptoe.com
212-206-3900
Party name: Fourth Amendment Scholars
Brian Michael Willen
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019-6022

bwillen@wsgr.com
(212) 999-5800
Party name: Privacy International, Human and Digital Rights Organizations, and International Legal Scholars
Brett Johnston Williamson
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
Times Square Tower
Seven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

bwilliamson@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice, the American Civil Liberties Union, the Electronic Frontier Foundation, Restore the Fourth, and the R Street Institute
Marc J. Zwillinger
    Counsel of Record
Zwillgen PLLC
1900 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

marc@zwillgen.com
202-296-3585
Party name: Technology Companies

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543