Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-175
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-175
Title:Emmanuel Q. Bartee, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 2, 2017
Linked with 16A1135
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(16-0391)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 19 2017Application (16A1135) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2017 to July 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 19 2017Application (16A1135) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 28, 2017.
Jul 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017)
Aug 11 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Aug 16 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Aug 29 2017Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2017)
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 30, 2017.
Oct 19 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2017 to December 6, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2017
Dec 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rey Andrew Austria
    Counsel of Record
U.S. Navy-Marine Corps Appellate Defense Division
1254 Charles Morris St., SE
Bldg. 58, Suite 100
Washington Navy Yard, DC 20374-5124

rey.austria@navy.mil
(202) 685-7054
Party name: Emmanuel Q. Bartee
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543