Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1705
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1705
Title:PDR Network, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc.
Docketed:June 26, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2185)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 01 2018Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2018)
Aug 29 2018Brief of respondent Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Reply of petitioners PDR Network, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Whether the Hobbs Act required the district court in this case to accept the FCC's legal interpretation of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act.
Nov 27 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 8, 2019.
Jan 08 2019Brief of petitioners PDR Network, LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners PDR Network, LLC, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Aditya Bamzai filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2019Brief amici curiae of State and Local Government Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Chamber of Commerce in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 25, 2019
Feb 07 2019Brief of respondent Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 14 2019Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2019Corrected Certificate of Compliance from the Electronic Privacy Information Center filed. (2/19/2019)
Main Document
Feb 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Mar 04 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 11 2019Reply of petitioners PDR Network, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Argued. For petitioners: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Glenn L. Hara, Rolling Meadows, Ill.; and Rachel P. Kovner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Jun 20 2019Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Gorsuch, J., joined. Kavanaugh, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment, in which Thomas, Alito, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined.
Jul 22 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: PDR Network, LLC, et al.
Jeffrey Neal RosenthalBlank Rome LLP
One Logan Square, 130 N. 18th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rosenthal-j@blankrome.com
2155695553
Party name: PDR Network, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Glenn L. Hara
    Counsel of Record
Anderson + Wanca
3701 Algonquin Road, Suite 500
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008

ghara@andersonwanca.com
(847) 368-1500
Party name: Carlton & Harris Chiropractic, Inc.
Other
Aditya Bamzai
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22901

abamzai@law.virginia.edu
434-243-0698
Party name: Aditya Bamzai
Megan L. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbrown@wileyrein.com
2027197000
Party name: U.S. CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES
Ashley Elizabeth Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75205

ajohnson@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3111
Party name: State and Local Government Associations
Charles H. Kennedy
    Counsel of Record
The Kennedy Privacy Law Firm
1050 30th Street, NW
Suite 409
Washington, DC 20007

ckennedy@kennedyonprivacy.com
2022503704
Party name: American Bankers Association, Consumer Bankers Association, Independent Community Bankers of America
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543