Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1657
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1657
Title:Mission Product Holdings, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Tempnology, LLC, nka Old Cold LLC
Docketed:June 12, 2018
Linked with 17A1060
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-9016)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2018Application (17A1060) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 12, 2018 to June 11, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Application (17A1060) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until June 11, 2018.
Jun 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 28 2018Waiver of right of respondent Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC to respond filed.
Jul 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 09 2018Response Requested. (Due August 8, 2018)
Jul 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Aug 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Reply of petitioner Mission Product Holdings, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 25 2018Letter of October 23, 2018 from counsel for respondent received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 26 2018Letter of October 25, 2018 from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 26 2018Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Dec 10 2018Brief of petitioner Mission Product Holdings, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 12 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of The International Trademark Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 20, 2019.
Dec 21 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 09 2019Brief of respondent Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Jan 15 2019CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of one envelop containing the Joint Appendix.
Jan 22 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 08 2019Reply of petitioner Mission Product Holdings, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2019Argued. For petitioner: Danielle Spinelli, Washington, D. C.; and Zachary D. Tripp, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Danielle Mary Spinelli
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Mission Product Holdings, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC
Lee HarringtonNixon Peabody LLP
100 Summer Street
Boston, MA 02492

lharrington@nixonpeabody.com
(617)-345-1000
Party name: Tempnology, LLC, n/k/a Old Cold LLC
Other
David H. Bernstein
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise and Plimpton LLP
919 Third Ave.
New York, NY 10022

dhbernstein@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: The International Trademark Association
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Law Professors
Theodore H. Davis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
404-815-6534
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: UNITED STATES
Stephen J. Smirti Jr.
    Counsel of Record
RIVKIN RADLER LLP
926 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556

steve.smirti@rivkin.com
516-357-3000
Party name: NEW YORK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW ASSOCIATION
Travis Ryan Wimberly
    Counsel of Record
Pirkey Barber PLLC
600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2120
Austin, TX 78701

twimberly@pirkeybarber.com
512-322-5200
Party name: INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543