Docket for 17-139 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 24 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2017) | | | Aug 25 2017 | Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. | | | Sep 12 2017 | Reply of petitioner Anthony Bell filed. | | | Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|