Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-130
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-130
Title:Raymond J. Lucia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Securities and Exchange Commission
Docketed:July 26, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1345)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2017)
Jul 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Raymond J. Lucia, et al. on 07/31/2017
Aug 16 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 25, 2017.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Mark Cuban filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Sep 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 25, 2017.
Sep 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Oct 17 2017Letter of October 17, 2017 from counsel for petitioners received.
Oct 18 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 15, 2017.
Nov 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2017 to November 29, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017.
Nov 29 2017Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Dec 13 2017Reply of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jan 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Raymond J. Lucia, et al..
Blanket Consent
Jan 18 2018Anton Metlitsky, Esquire, of New York, New York, is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
Jan 26 2018Letter of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. on behalf of the parties filed.
Main Document
Feb 07 2018The joint appendix, petitioners' brief on the merits, and brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission shall be filed on or before February 21, 2018. Any amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners or in support of neither party shall be filed on or before February 28, 2018.
Feb 07 2018The brief of Court-Appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below shall be filed on or before March 26, 2018. Any other amicus curiae brief supporting affirmance (the judgment below) shall be filed on or before April 2, 2018.
Feb 07 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Securities and Exchange Commission
Blanket Consent
Feb 08 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Feb 21 2018Brief of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in support of petitioners filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 23, 2018.
Feb 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of SHOW, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Federal Administrative Law Judges Conference in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Forum of United States Administrative Law Judges in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Scholars in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Utah, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jennifer L. Mascott filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of RD Legal Capital, LLC and Roni Dersovitz filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of J.S. Oliver Capital Management, L.P. and Ian O. Mausner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Urska Velikonja and Joseph A. Grundfest in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Wing F. Chau filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Equity Dealers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Scholars of Corpus Linguistics filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 26 2018Brief of Court-appointed amicus curiae in suport of the judgment below filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 30 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Mar 30 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional and Administrative Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amici curiae of David Zaring filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Black Lung Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association of Administrative Law Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cornell Securities Law Clinic filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Organization of Social Security Claimants' Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 13 2018Reply of petitioners Raymond J. Lucia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2018Reply of respondent Securities and Exchange Commission in support of petitioners filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 16 2018Record received from the United States Securities and Exchange Commission. The record is electronic.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Raymond J. Lucia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Gerald Marvin Bober
    Counsel of Record
3909 Long Trail Way
Reisterstown, MD 21136

judginator@gmail.com
4108336303
Party name: The Forum of United States Administrative Law Judges
Rowland David Broiles
    Counsel of Record
David Broiles
2400 Indian Cove
Fort Worth, TX 76108

davidbroiles@gmail.com
817-246-7801
Party name: Show, Inc.
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
5712169450
Party name: Professor Jennifer L. Mascott
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Association of Administrative Law Judges
Oliver J. Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19109

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Equity Dealers of America
Albert Quoc Giang
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LL P
725 S. Figueroa Street
31st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

agiang@bsfllp.com
2136299040
Party name: RD Legal Capital, LLC and Roni Dersovitz
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional and Administrative Law Scholars
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: States of Utah, et al.
William Alan Jacobson
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Securities Law Clinic Cornell Law School
138 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

waj24@cornell.edu
607-255-6293
Party name: Cornell Securities Law Clinic
Alex Lipman
    Counsel of Record
Brown Rudnick, LLP
Seven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

alipman@brownrudnick.com
212-209-4800
Party name: Wing F. Chau
Alex Lipman
    Counsel of Record
Brown Rudnick, LLP
Seven Times Square
Seven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

alipman@brownrudnick.com
212-209-4800
Party name: Mark Cuban
Katharine Minkel Mapes
    Counsel of Record
Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP
1875 Eye Street, NW, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20006

Katharine.mapes@spiegelmcd.com
202-879-4000
Party name: David Zaring
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in suport of the judgment below
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jfmitche@stanford.edu
(650) 723-1397
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Andrew Joseph Morris
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

amorris@orrick.com
202-339-8400
Party name: J.S. Oliver Capital Management, L.P. and Ian O. Mausner
Richard James Pierce Jr.
    Counsel of Record
George Washington University School of Law
2000 H Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20052

rpierce@law.gwu.edu
7033041623
Party name: Administrative Law Scholars
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

anthony.sabino@sabinolaw.com
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino
Stephen Arthur Sanders
    Counsel of Record
Appalachian Citizens Law Ctr.
317 Main St.
Whitesburg, KY 41858

steve@appalachianlawcenter.org
6066333929
Party name: National Black Lung Association
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Duncan
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Scholars of Corpus Linguistics
Eric Schnaufer
    Counsel of Record
Eric Schnaufer, Attorney at Law, P.C.
1555 Sherman Ave.
#303
Evanston, IL 60201

eric@schnaufer.com
8477331232
Party name: National Organization of Social Security Claimants' Representatives
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
John Michael Vittone
    Counsel of Record
8101 Connecticut Avenue
Apt. C-303
Chevy Chase, MD 20815

vittone.john@gmail.com
3015850592
Party name: Federal Administrative Law Judges Conference
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue, NW
Room 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Urksa Velikonja and Joseph A. Grundfest

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543