Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1289
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1289
Title:Donnie Lowe, Petitioner
v.
Rick Raemisch, et al.
Docketed:March 14, 2018
Linked with 17A650
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1300)
   Decision Date:July 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2017Application (17A650) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2018 to March 9, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 19 2017Application (17A650) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 9, 2018.
Mar 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Mar 15 2018Waiver of right of respondents Rick Raemisch, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Mar 23 2018Response Requested. (Due April 23, 2018)
Apr 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 23, 2018 to June 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 22, 2018.
Jun 22 2018Brief of respondents Rick Raemisch, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2018Reply of petitioners Donnie Lowe, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion -- also in No. 17-1284). Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel M. Greenfield
    Counsel of Record
MacArthur Justice Center
Northwestern Pritzker School of Law
375 E. Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611-3069

daniel-greenfield@law.northwestern.edu
(312) 503-8538
Party name: Donnie Lowe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Glenn Evans Roper
    Counsel of Record
Colorado Attorney General's Office
1300 Broadway, 10th floor
Denver, CO 80203

glenn.roper@coag.gov
720-508-6562
Party name: Rick Raemisch, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543