Nov 21 2017 | Application (17A567) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 24, 2017 to February 22, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Nov 30 2017 | Application (17A567) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 22, 2018. |
| |
Feb 22 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018. |
| |
Apr 10 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 25, 2018 to May 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 11 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 25, 2018. |
| |
May 15 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 25, 2018 to June 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
May 16 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 25, 2018. |
| |
Jun 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2018 to July 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 22 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 25, 2018. |
| |
Jul 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jul 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 24, 2018. |
| |
Aug 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 24, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Aug 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 24, 2018. |
| |
Sep 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 24, 2018 to October 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 24, 2018. |
| |
Oct 23 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 24, 2018 to December 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Oct 24 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 13, 2018. |
| |
Dec 12 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 13 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 14, 2019. |
| |
Jan 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2019 to March 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is furhter extended to and including March 7, 2019. |
| |
Mar 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2019 to April 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Mar 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 8, 2019. |
| |
Apr 04 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Apr 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019. |
| |
May 08 2019 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
May 28 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019. |
| |
May 28 2019 | Reply of petitioner Jorge Avila Torrez filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 17 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
| |