Docket for 17-1179
|
Dec 22 2017 | Application (17A685) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service | Dec 28 2017 | Application (17A685) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 21, 2018. | | | Feb 21 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 14 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2018 to April 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 20 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 25, 2018. | | | Mar 26 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, et al. filed. | | Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document | Mar 26 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 26 2018 | Amicus brief of Property Casualty Insurers Association of America, American Insurance Association, National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies, New York Insurance Association, Inc. not accepted for filing. (March 26, 2018) | | | Apr 25 2018 | Brief of respondents State of New York, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 14 2018 | Reply of petitioners American Economy Insurance Co., et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | May 15 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018. | | | Jun 04 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|