SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1140
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1140
Title:
Leon Stambler, Petitioner
v.
Mastercard International Inc.
Docketed:
February 13, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2017-1272)
Decision Date:
November 13, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 09 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2018)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 28 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 02 2018
Response Requested. (Due May 2, 2018)
Apr 18 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 2, 2018 to June 1, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 1, 2018.
Jun 01 2018
Brief of respondent Mastercard International Inc. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jun 20 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 20 2018
Reply of petitioner Leon Stambler filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edward R. Nelson III
Counsel of Record
Nelson Bumgardner Casto, P.C.
3131 West 7th Street
Suite 300
Fort Worth, TX 76107
ed@nelbum.com
817-377-9111
Party name: Leon Stambler
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert C. Scheinfeld
Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
30 Rockefeller Plaza, 44th Floor
New York, NY 10112-4498
robert.scheinfeld@bakerbotts.com
(212)-408-2512
Party name: Mastercard International Inc.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##