Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1003
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1003
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Regents of the University of California, et al.
Docketed:January 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15068)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2018Motion to Expedite filed by petitioner Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Response to motion from respondents States of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Response to motion from respondents Regents of the University of California; Janet Napolitano, President of the University of California filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Response to motion from respondents Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Norma Ramirez, and Jirayut Latthivongskorn filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Reply in support of motion to expedite filed by petitioner Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 23 2018The motion of petitioners to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is granted in part. As respondents have agreed, they will file their briefs in opposition by February 2, 2018.
Jan 25 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Dulce Garcia, Miriam Gonzalez Avila, Saul Jimenez Suarez, Viridiana Chabolla Mendoza, Norma Ramirez, and Jirayut Latthivongskorn.
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 02 2018Brief of respondents States of California, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief of respondents Regents of the University of California; Janet Napolitano, President of the University of California in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2018Brief of respondents Dulce Garcia, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018Reply of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2018Letter of February 14, 2018 from the Solicitor General received. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment DENIED without prejudice. It is assumed that the Court of Appeals will proceed expeditiously to decide this case.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Dulce Garcia, et al.
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Regents of the University of California; Janet Napolitano, President of the University of California
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 703-2548
Party name: States of California, et al.
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Ave NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
5125902655
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave W
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

jmorgan@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543