Docket for 16-9678 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 14 2017 | Application (16A1001) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 20, 2017 to June 19, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | | Apr 19 2017 | Application (16A1001) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 19, 2017. | | | Jun 19 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 24, 2017) | | | Jul 18 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017. | | | Aug 21 2017 | Brief of respondent Charlotte Jenkins, Warden in opposition filed. | | | Sep 07 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|