Docket for 16-9657 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 15 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 24, 2017) | | | Jul 24 2017 | Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. | | | Aug 10 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|