Docket for 16-9453 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jan 22 2017 | Application (16A762) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 31, 2017 to April 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Jan 30 2017 | Application (16A762) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 1, 2017. | | | Apr 03 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 10, 2017) | | | Jun 28 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 9, 2017. | | | Aug 04 2017 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | | Aug 24 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|