Docket for 16-9446 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Dec 20 2016 | Application (16A629) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2017 to March 31, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Jan 03 2017 | Application (16A629) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 31, 2017. | | | Mar 30 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 6, 2017) | | | Jul 06 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017. | | | Aug 03 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017. | | | Sep 06 2017 | Brief of respondent Davis, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed. | | | Sep 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Moore v. Texas, 581 U. S. ____ (2017). | | | Nov 14 2017 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|