Docket for 16-9288 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 03 2017 | Application (16A873) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 20, 2017 to May 19, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Mar 07 2017 | Application (16A873) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 19, 2017. | | | May 19 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 22, 2017) | | | Jun 21 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017. | | | Jul 24 2017 | Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. | | | Aug 08 2017 | Reply of petitioner Guillermo O. Arbelaez filed. (Distributed) | | | Aug 10 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|