SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 16-9073
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 16-9073
Title:
Shan Edward Carter, Petitioner
v.
Edward Thomas, Warden
Docketed:
May 8, 2017
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-6996)
Decision Date:
December 20, 2016
Rehearing Denied:
January 30, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2017
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 7, 2017)
Jun 22 2017
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shan Edward Carter
#0486636
Central Prison
4285 Mail Service Center
Raleigh, NC 27699-4285
Party name: Shan Edward Carter
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##