Docket for 16-460
|
Oct 06 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 7, 2016) | | | Oct 19 2016 | Waiver of right of respondent District of Columbia to respond filed. | | | Nov 02 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. | | | Nov 03 2016 | Response Requested. (Due December 5, 2016) | | | Dec 01 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2017. | | | Jan 04 2017 | Brief of respondent District of Columbia in opposition filed. | | | Jan 17 2017 | Reply of petitioner Stephanie C. Artis filed. | | | Jan 18 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. | | | Feb 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. | | | Feb 27 2017 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Mar 29 2017 | The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 25, 2017. | | | Mar 29 2017 | The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 11, 2017. | | | May 11 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Stephanie C. Artis. | | | May 25 2017 | Brief of petitioner Stephanie C. Artis filed. | | | May 30 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. | | | Aug 11 2017 | Brief of respondent District of Columbia filed. | | | Aug 18 2017 | Motion of Wisconsin and 23 other states for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed. | | | Aug 18 2017 | Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed. | | | Aug 18 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Wisconsin and 23 other states filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 1, 2017 | | | Sep 07 2017 | CIRCULATED | | | Sep 11 2017 | Reply of petitioner Stephanie C. Artis filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 12 2017 | Record requested from the D.C. Court of Appeals. | | | Sep 25 2017 | Motion of Wisconsin and 23 other states for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED. | | | Nov 01 2017 | Argued. For petitioner: Adam G. Unikowsky, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Loren L. AliKhan, Deputy Solicitor General, Washington, D. C. | | | Jan 22 2018 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kennedy, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined. | | | Feb 23 2018 | MANDATE ISSUED. | | | Feb 23 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|