Docket for 16-1518 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Apr 04 2017 | Application (16A971) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 9, 2017 to May 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Apr 12 2017 | Application (16A971) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 10, 2017. | | | May 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2017) | | | Jun 29 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 21, 2017. | | | Aug 21 2017 | Brief of respondent Frank A. Walls in opposition filed. | | | Aug 21 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Frank A. Walls. | | | Sep 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|