Docket for 16-1398
|
May 23 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2017) | | | Jun 13 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2017. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Exporters and Importers filed. | | | Jun 22 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Manufacturers filed. | | | Jul 24 2017 | Brief of respondent United States, ex rel. Customs Fraud Investigations, LLC in opposition filed. | | | Aug 01 2017 | Supplemental brief of respondent United States, ex rel. Customs Fraud Investigations, LLC filed. | | | Aug 08 2017 | Reply of petitioner Victaulic Co. filed. (Distributed) | | | Aug 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|