Docket for 16-1116 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Mar 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 17, 2017) | | | Mar 10 2017 | Appendix of Charlotte Jenkins, Warden filed. | | | Apr 05 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 1, 2017. | | | May 01 2017 | Brief of respondent Percy Hutton in opposition filed. | | | May 01 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Percy Hutton. | | | May 15 2017 | Reply of petitioner Charlotte Jenkins, Warden filed. (Distributed) | | | May 16 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017. | | | Jun 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017. | | | Jun 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. | | | Jun 19 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. | | | Jun 19 2017 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion) | | | Jul 14 2017 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | | Aug 03 2017 | DISTRIBUTED. | | | Aug 25 2017 | Rehearing DENIED. | | | Aug 25 2017 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|