Docket for 16-1105
|
Mar 09 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2017) | | | Apr 10 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Facebook, Inc. to respond filed. | | | Apr 13 2017 | Letter of April 11, 2017, from counsel for petitioners received. | | | Apr 19 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017. | | | Apr 25 2017 | Response Requested. (Due May 25, 2017) | | | Apr 27 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 26, 2017. | | | May 25 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. | | | Jun 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Facebook, Inc. in opposition filed. | | | Jun 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Jun 30 2017 | Reply of petitioner Power Ventures, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Jul 17 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Sep 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|