Docket for 16-1067
|
Mar 02 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2017) | | | Mar 30 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Robert Smith, et al. to respond filed. | | | Apr 03 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center, et al. filed. | | | Apr 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. | | | Apr 12 2017 | Response Requested. (Due May 12, 2017) | | | Apr 25 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 12, 2017. | | | Jun 14 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 12, 2017. | | | Jul 12 2017 | Brief of respondents Robert Smith, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Jul 18 2017 | Reply of petitioner Charles Murphy filed. | | | Jul 26 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Aug 25 2017 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Sep 05 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Charles Murphy. | | | Sep 29 2017 | Brief of petitioner Charles Murphy filed. | | | Oct 06 2017 | Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties, et al. filed. | | | Oct 06 2017 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 6, 2017 | | | Oct 10 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. | | | Oct 20 2017 | CIRCULATED | | | Oct 30 2017 | Brief of respondents Robert Smith, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Nov 06 2017 | Brief amici curiae of States of Michigan, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Nov 16 2017 | Reply of petitioner Charles Murphy filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 06 2017 | Argued. For petitioner: Stuart Banner, Los Angeles, Cal. For respondents: Brett E. Legner, Deputy Solicitor General, Chicago, Ill. | | | Feb 21 2018 | Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, and Kagan, JJ., joined. | | | Mar 26 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|