Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-1262
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 15-1262
Title:Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al., Appellants
v.
David Harris, et al.
Docketed:April 11, 2016
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:13-cv-949)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 08 2016Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due May 11, 2016)
May 11 2016Motion to affirm filed by appellees David Harris and Christine Bowser
May 24 2016Reply of appellants Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed.
May 31 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016.
Jun 20 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016.
Jun 27 2016PROBABLE JURISDICTION NOTED.
Jul 06 2016Record received from U.S.D.C. Middle District of North Carolina (Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal). The record is electronic.
Aug 03 2016The time to file the joint appendix and appellants' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 12, 2016.
Sep 12 2016Brief of appellants Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed.
Sep 12 2016Joint appendix filed (7 Volumes). (Statement of costs filed.)
Sep 14 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for appellants.
Sep 16 2016Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for appellees.
Sep 16 2016Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Oct 12 2016Brief of appellees David Harris and Christine Bowser filed.
Oct 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed.
Oct 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Oct 19 2016Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center, et al. filed.
Oct 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Oct 19 2016Brief amicus curiae of The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law filed.
Oct 19 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Oct 21 2016SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 5, 2016
Oct 26 2016CIRCULATED.
Nov 01 2016Record requested from U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of North Carolina.
Nov 07 2016Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 10 2016Record received from the U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of North Carolina is electronic.
Nov 14 2016Reply of appellants Patrick McCrory, Governor of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 05 2016Argued. For appellants: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Mark E. Elias, Washington, D. C.; and Nicole A. Saharsky, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
May 22 2017Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion. Alito, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment in part and dissenting in part, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, J., joined. Gorsuch, J., took no part in the consideration or decision of this case.
Jun 26 2017JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Thomas A. FarrOgletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
4208 Six Forks Road., Suite 1100
Raleigh, NC 27609

thomas.farr@ogletreedeakins.com
(919) 787-9700
Party name: Roy Cooper, Governor of North Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Marc E. Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 Thirteenth Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
(202) 654-6200
Party name: David Harris and Christine Bowser
Other
Debo P. AdegbileWilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

deboadegbile@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
Brianne Jenna GorodConstitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
(202) 296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
John J. Park Jr.Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678) 347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
Bradley S. PhillipsMunger Tolles & Olson LLP
355 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bradley.Phillips@mto.com
(213) 683-9100
Party name: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Nicole A. SaharskyAssistant to the Solicitor General
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Department of Justice
Washington, DC 20530

(202)-514-2201
Party name: United States
Paul M. SmithCampaign Legal Center
1411 K Street NW
Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
(202) 736-2200
Party name: Campaign Legal Center, et al.
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543