Docket for 08-539
|
Sep 12 2008 | Application (08A228) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 22, 2008 to October 22, 2008, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Sep 12 2008 | Application (08A228) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 22, 2008. | | | Oct 22 2008 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 24, 2008) | | | Nov 24 2008 | Brief of respondents Robert Simon, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Dec 10 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009. | | | Dec 10 2008 | Reply of petitioners Republic of Iraq, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Dec 17 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009. | | | Dec 19 2008 | Supplemental brief of respondents Robert Simon, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Jan 09 2009 | Petition GRANTED the case is consolidated with No. 07-1090 and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The briefs of petitioners are to be filed on or before Thursday, February 19, 2009. The briefs of respondents are to be filed on or before Wednesday, March 18, 2009. Reply briefs, if any, are to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. | | | Feb 19 2009 | Joint appendix filed (2 volumes). Statement of costs received. VIDED. | | | Feb 19 2009 | Brief of petitioners Republic of Iraq, et al. filed. VIDED. | | | Feb 23 2009 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, April 20, 2009. | | | Feb 26 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED. | | | Mar 09 2009 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the District of Columbia. (1 box) | | | Mar 13 2009 | DISTRIBUTED. VIDED. | | | Mar 18 2009 | Brief of respondents Jordan Beaty, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | | Mar 18 2009 | Brief of respondents Robert Simon, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | | Mar 20 2009 | Brief amici curiae of James S. Vine, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 24 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED. | | | Mar 24 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for Justice and Accountability filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Human Rights Committee of the American Branch of the International Law Association filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Stephen Neale filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Tortured American Prisoners of War filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amicus curiae of Plaintiffs in Peterson v. Islamic Republic of Iran, CA 01-2094 (RCL), 01-2684 (RCL) United States District Court for the District of Columbia filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Dr. Louis Fisher and Dr. Robert J. Spitzer filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amici curiae of St. Mary's University School of Law, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Brief amici curiae of Eleven Members of Congress, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | | Mar 25 2009 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED. | | | Apr 01 2009 | Response to motion of the Solicitor General filed by respondents. | | | Apr 06 2009 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. | | | Apr 06 2009 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondent DENIED. | | | Apr 10 2009 | Reply of petitioners Republic of Iraq, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | | Apr 13 2009 | Supplemental brief of respondents filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | | Apr 14 2009 | Motion to strike supplemental brief of respondents filed by petitioners Republic of Iraq, et al. VIDED. | | | Apr 14 2009 | Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2009. | | | Apr 17 2009 | Motion of petitioners to strike supplemental brief of respondents GRANTED. | | | Apr 20 2009 | Argued. For petitioners: Jonathan S. Franklin, Washington, D.C.; and Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Thomas C. Goldstein, Washington, D.C. | | | Jun 08 2009 | Judgment REVERSED. Scalia, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. | | | Jul 10 2009 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|