Sep 18 2007 | Application (07A247) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 15, 2007 to November 14, 2007, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
| |
Sep 24 2007 | Application (07A247) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 14, 2007. |
| |
Nov 07 2007 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2007) |
| |
Nov 20 2007 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 9, 2008. |
| |
Jan 08 2008 | Brief of respondent Dariush Elahi in opposition filed. |
| |
Jan 17 2008 | Reply of petitioner Ministry of Defense and Support for the Armed Forces of the Islamic Republic of Iran filed. |
| |
Jan 23 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 15, 2008. |
| |
Feb 19 2008 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. |
| |
May 23 2008 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
| |
May 30 2008 | Supplemental brief of respondent in response to brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. |
| |
Jun 03 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 19, 2008. |
| |
Jun 04 2008 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Ministry of Defense and Support for the Armed Forces of the Islamic Republic of Iran filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Jun 23 2008 | Petition GRANTED. |
| |
Jul 15 2008 | The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 8, 2008. |
| |
Jul 15 2008 | The time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 12, 2008. |
| |
Sep 08 2008 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
| |
Sep 08 2008 | Brief of petitioner Ministry of Defense and Support for the Armed Forces of the Islamic Republic of Iran filed. |
| |
Sep 15 2008 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
| |
Nov 04 2008 | CIRCULATED. |
| |
Nov 07 2008 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, January 12, 2009. |
| |
Nov 07 2008 | Letter from the Solicitor General proposing to lodge copies of non-record material under seal. |
| |
Nov 12 2008 | Brief of respondent Dariush Elahi filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Nov 19 2008 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. |
| |
Nov 26 2008 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the 9th Circuit. (1 envelope) |
| |
Dec 01 2008 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. |
| |
Dec 10 2008 | Reply of petitioner Ministry of Defense and Support for the Armed Forces of the Islamic Republic of Iran filed. (Distributed) |
| |
Dec 11 2008 | Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Southern District of California. (1 box). |
| |
Jan 12 2009 | Argued. For petitioner: David J. Bederman, Atlanta, GA For United States as amicus curiae: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Carter G. Phillips, Washington, D.C. |
| |
Jan 16 2009 | Letter and attachment received from counsel for the respondent. (Distributed). |
| |
Mar 10 2009 | Proposed lodging of the Solicitor General approved by the Clerk. |
| |
Mar 11 2009 | Received 12 copies of sealed materials from the Solicitor General to be lodged at the request of the Court (3 volumes) |
| |
Apr 21 2009 | Judgment REVERSED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Stevens, Scalia, Thomas, and Alito, JJ., joined, and in which Kennedy, Souter, and Ginsburg, JJ., joined as to Parts I and II. Kennedy, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Souter and Ginsburg, JJ., joined. |
| |
May 26 2009 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |
Jun 18 2009 | Record returned to the U.S.D.C. for the Southern District of California. |
| |