Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-915
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-915
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Zackey Rahimi
Docketed:March 21, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-11001)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Apr 10 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 20, 2023 to May 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2023.
Apr 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of California Governor Gavin Newsom filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Texas Advocacy Project filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Gun Violence and Domestic Violence Prevention Groups filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of New York County Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Joshua Horwitz, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2023 to June 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2023Response to motion to extend the time to file a response filed.
Main Document
May 16 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including May 30, 2023.
May 30 2023Brief of respondent Zackey Rahimi in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 30 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docketed June 5, 2023) filed by respondent Zackey Rahimi.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 received.
Main Document
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED.
Aug 04 2023Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Aug 14 2023Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 14 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Patrick J. Charles in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of 97Percent filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of California Legislative Women's Caucus filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of City of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Educators, Practitioners, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney et al filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of New York County Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors of History and Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Legal Aid Chicago, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Religious Leaders and Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Reproductive Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Senator Richard Blumenthal, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Senator Amy Klobuchar, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Gun Violence and Domestic Violence Prevention Groups filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Public-Health Researchers and Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Former State Chief Justices and Chief Judges filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Global Action On Gun Violence, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Prosecutors Against Gun Violence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of California Governor Gavin Newsom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of March For Our Lives Action Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of AEquitas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Texas Advocacy Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Crime Commission of New York City filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Mary Anne Franks filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Houston Area Women’s Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Everytown for Gun Safety filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Amicus brief of Prosecutor and Law Enforcement Associations and Office not accepted for filing. (Dupilicate submission--August 24, 2023)
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Prosecutor and Law Enforcement Associations, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief amici curiae of The Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment and Appeals Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Americans Against Gun Violence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including September 27, 2023.
Sep 06 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 7, 2023.
Sep 07 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Sep 14 2023Record from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas received electronically and available with the Clerk. The USCA-5 record is available on PACER.
Sep 18 2023CIRCULATED
Sep 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Prosecutor Integrity filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2023Brief of respondent Zackey Rahimi filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Gun Rights filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Alameda County Public Defenders, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Nicholas Johnson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2023Brief amici curiae of Phyllis Schlafly Eagles and Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amici curiae of The Bronx Defenders Union and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. and Gun Owners of California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of FPC Action Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Groups and Firearms Rights Groups filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of National African American Gun Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Second Amendment Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Angus Kirk McClellan, PhD. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Center for Human Liberty filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Crime Prevention Research Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Rifle Associationof America, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amici curiae of William English, Ph.D. and Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2023Proposal to lodge filed.
Main Document
Oct 25 2023Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2023Amicus brief of Professor Lorianne Updike-Toler not accepted for filing. (Corrected version to be submitted--November 09, 2023.)
Nov 02 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Professor Lorianne Updike-Toler. (Corrected filing submitted November 22, 2023.)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 07 2023Argued. For petitioner: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: J. Matthew Wright, Assistant Federal Public Defender, Amarillo, Tex.
Dec 11 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by Professor Lorianne Updike-Toler DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
James Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
500 S. Taylor Street
Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79101

MATTHEW_WRIGHT@FD.ORG
8063242370
Party name: Zackey Rahimi
Other
Jonathan D. Hacker
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

JHACKER@OMM.COM
202-383-5300
Party name: Gun Violence and Domestic Violence Prevention Groups
Carly O'Halloran Alameda
    Counsel of Record
Farella Braun + Martel LLP
One Bush Street, Suite 900
San Francisco, CA 94104

calameda@fbm.com
(415) 954-4981
Party name: Americans Against Gun Violence
Barry Kevin Arrington
    Counsel of Record
Arrington Law Firm
4195 Wadsworth Boulevard
Wheat Ridge, CO 80033

BARRY@ARRINGTONPC.COM
3032057870
Party name: National Association for Gun Rights
Jonathan Klee Baum
    Counsel of Record
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
525 W. Monroe St.
Chicago, IL 60661

jonathan.baum@katten.com
(312) 902-5400
Party name: Global Action On Gun Violence, Professors Leila Sadat, Carl T. Bogus, and Drury D. Stevenson
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
701 University Avenue, Suite 106
Sacramento, CA 95825

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition
H. Christopher Boehning
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

cboehning@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Senator Richard Blumenthal, Representative Mike Thompson, And 169 Other U.S. Senators And Representatives
Vincent J. Brunkow
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of San Diego, Inc.
225 Broadway, Ste. 900
San Diego, CA 92101

VINCE_BRUNKOW@FD.ORG
6192348467
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Aimee Jeanne Carlisle
    Counsel of Record
The Bronx Defenders
360 E 161st St.
Bronx, NY 10451

acarlisle@bronxdefenders.org
718-508-3400
Party name: The Bronx Defenders Union and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Professor Lorianne Updike-Toler
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Emilie B. Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

emilie.cooper@friedfrank.com
(212) 859-8311
Party name: Religious Leaders and Organizations
Carolyn Frances Corwin
    Counsel of Record
Covington and Burling LLP
One City Center
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

ccorwin@cov.com
202-662-5338
Party name: Prosecutor and Law Enforcement Associations and Office
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

RDEARING@LAW.NYC.GOV
(212) 356-2500
Party name: City of New York and Fourteen Other Cities and Counties
Eric Del Pozo
    Counsel of Record
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
260 Madison Avenue
21st Floor
New York, NY 10016

edelpozo@goodwin.com
(212) 376-3010
Party name: Prosecutors Against Gun Violence
Michael John Dell
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel, LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mdell@kramerlevin.com
212-715-9129
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.
Jonathan L. Diesenhaus
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells, US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

jonathan.diesenhaus@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637 5416
Party name: March For Our Lives Action Fund
Steven W. Dulan
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Steven W. Dulan, PLC
5311 Park Lake Road
East Lansing, MI 48823

swdulan@stevenwdulan.com
517-332-3149
Party name: Crime Prevention Research Center
Scott A. Edelman
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2029 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067

SEDELMAN@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(310) 552-8500
Party name: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36064

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3342621245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Erin Marie Erhardt
    Counsel of Record
National Rifle Foundation
11250 Waples Mill Road
Fairfax, VA 22030

eerhardt@nrahq.org
7032671158
Party name: National Rifle Association
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

MARK.FLEMING@WILMERHALE.COM
6175266000
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
Charles Randall Flores
    Counsel of Record
Flores Law PLLC
917 Franklin Street
Suite 600
Houston, TX 77002

cf@chadfloreslaw.com
713-893-9444
Party name: Angus Kirk McClellan, PhD.
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
FPC Action Foundation
5550 Painted Mirage Rd
Suite 320
Las Vegas, NV 89149

jgreenlee@fpclaw.org
(916) 517-1665
Party name: FPC Action Foundation
Stephen Porter Halbrook
    Counsel of Record
Stephen P. Halbrook, PH.D.Attorney at Law
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

protell@aol.com
703-352-7276
Party name: National African American Gun Association, Inc.
Robin B. Johansen
    Counsel of Record
Olson Remcho, LLP
1901 Harrison Street, Suite 1550
Oakland, CA 94612

courtfilings@olsonremcho.com
510-346-6200
Party name: California Legislative Women's Caucus
Michelle Shane Kallen
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MKallen@jenner.com
8047867240
Party name: Senator Amy Klobuchar, Representative Brian Fitzpatrick, and Representative Debbie Dingell
Diana Kasdan
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
199 Water Street
22nd Floor
New York, NY 10038

dkasdan@reprorights.org
(917) 637-3697
Party name: Center for Reproductive Rights
Adam Menke Katz
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
500 Boylston Street
Boston, MA 02116

akatz@cooley.com
(617) 937-2351
Party name: Former State Chief Justices and Chief Judges
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Independence Institute, Second Amendment Law Center
John P. Krill Jr.
    Counsel of Record
K&L Gates LLP
17 North Second Street
18th Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101-1507

john.krill@klgates.com
717-231-4500
Party name: Nicholas Johnson
Michael K Krouse
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
250 West 55th Street
New York, NY 10019

michael.krouse@arnoldporter.com
9175872529
Party name: The Domestic Violence Legal Empowerment and Appeals Project, et al.
Aaron Robert Marcu
    Counsel of Record
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
31st Floor
New York, NY 10022

aaron.marcu@freshfields.com
(212) 277-4000
Party name: Educators, Practitioners, and Organizations with Expertise in Domestic Violence Protective Orders
Stephen Robert McAllister
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
4520 Main Street
Suite 1100
Kansas City, MO 64111-7700

STEPHEN.MCALLISTER@DENTONS.COM
8164602516
Party name: Legal Aid Chicago and Other Illinois Organizations
Hugh Emerson McKay
    Counsel of Record
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur
950 Main Ave.
Suite 500
Cleveland, OH 44113

hmckay@porterwright.com
4405375308
Party name: Patrick J. Charles
C. D. Michel
    Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates P.C.
180 E. Ocean Blvd.
Suite 200
Long Beach, CA 90802

CMICHEL@MICHELLAWYERS.COM
(562) 216-4444
Party name: California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. and Gun Owners of California
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Mary Kathryn Nagle, Esq.
P.O. Box 506
McLean, VA 22101

mkn@mknaglelaw.onmicrosoft.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Mass. Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

CNEILY@CATO.ORG
2024257499
Party name: Cato Institute and Goldwater Institute
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

JANE.NOTZ@ILAG.GOV
312-814-5376
Party name: Illinois et al.
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Heller Foundation, Tennessee Firearms Association, Grass Roots North Carolina, Rights Watch International, Virginia Citizens Defense League, America's Future, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Edward Andrew Paltzik
    Counsel of Record
Bochner PLLC
1040 Avenue of the Americas, 15th Floor
New York, NY 10018

edward@bochner.law
5165260341
Party name: The Second Amendment Foundation
Shane Andrew PenningtonPorter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP
2020 K. St. NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

shaneapennington@gmail.com
8329142985
Party name: Patrick J. Charles
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

DAN@DANPETERSONLAW.COM
7033527276
Party name: Law Enforcement Groups and Firearms Rights Groups
Constance Lynn Pfeiffer
    Counsel of Record
Yetter Coleman LLP
811 Main Street, Suite 4100
Houston, TX 77002

cpfeiffer@yettercoleman.com
713-632-8000
Party name: Houston Area Women’s Center
Douglas Maynard Poland
    Counsel of Record
Stafford Rosenbaum LLP
222 West Washington Avenue
Suite 900
Madison, WI 53703

dpoland@staffordlaw.com
608-256-0226
Party name: Professor Mary Anne Franks
James E. Preston
    Counsel of Record
Hauf & Forsythe
712 H St NE
Washington, DC 20002

prestonlaw@me.com
202-643-3917
Party name: National Coalition for Men
James E. Preston
    Counsel of Record
Hauf & Forsythe
712 H. Street NE
#739
Washington, DC 20002

prestonlaw@me.com
202-643-3917
Party name: Center for Prosecutor Integrity
Lawrence Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866-1005

rosentha@chapman.edu
714-628-2650
Party name: National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

NSAHARSKY@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: Joshua Horwitz, Kelly Roskam, Timothy Carey, and 12 Other Public-Health Researchers and Lawyers
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

HSANDICK@PBWT.COM
(212)336-2000
Party name: Citizens Crime Commission of New York City
Fredericka Searle Sargent
    Counsel of Record
Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney
401 W. Belknap
Fort Worth, TX 76196

fsargent@tarrantcountytx.gov
8178843109
Party name: Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney et al
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Phyllis Schlafly Eagles and Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: Everytown for Gun Safety
Mark D. Selwyn
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2600 EI Camino Real, Suite 400
Palo Alto, CA 94306

mark.selwyn@wilmerhale.com
6508586031
Party name: Professors of History and Law
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: New York County Lawyers Association
James Reid Sigel
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
425 Market St.
San Francisco, CA 94105

JSIGEL@MOFO.COM
415-268-6948
Party name: California Governor Gavin Newsom
Jason Patrick Stiehl
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
455 N. Cityfront Plaza Drive
Suite 3600
Chicago, IL 60611

jstiehl@crowell.com
3123214200
Party name: DC Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Other Domestic Violence Organizations
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Complex Appellate Litigation Group LLP
620 Newport Center Drive
Suite 1100
Newport Beach, CA 92660

mc.sungaila@calg.com
(949) 991 1900
Party name: AEquitas
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

DTHOMPSON@COOPERKIRK.COM
202-220-9600
Party name: Center for Human Liberty
Craig Lee Uhrich
    Counsel of Record
Bochner PLLC
1040 Avenue of the Americas
15th Floor
New York, NY 10018

craig.uhrich@gmail.com
(646) 971-0685
Party name: William English, Ph.D. and Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms
Joshi Ashoma Valentine
    Counsel of Record
Alameda County Public Defenders Office
1401 Lakeside Drive, Suite 400
Oakland, CA 94612

joshi.valentine@acgov.org
(510) 268-7486
Party name: Alameda County Public Defenders
Constance Grace Van Kley
    Counsel of Record
Upper Seven Law
1 N Last Chance Gulch
Helena, MT 59601

constance@uppersevenlaw.com
406-306-0330
Party name: 97Percent
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

DONALD.VERRILLI@MTO.COM
202-220-1100
Party name: Second Amendment Law Scholars
C. Andrew Weber
    Counsel of Record
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
303 Colorado Street
Suite 2000
Austin, TX 78701

ANDREW.WEBER@KELLYHART.COM
512-495-6451
Party name: Texas Advocacy Project

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543