Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20A120
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20A120
Title:Wendy Gish, et al., Applicants
v.
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California, et al.
Docketed:January 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55445 20-56324)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 07 2020Application (20A120) for injunctive relief, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Rule 12-6 Notice That Parties Below Have No Interest In The Outcome Of The Emergency Application for a Writ of Injunction of Wendy Gish, et al. not accepted for filing. (January 13, 2021)
Jan 10 2021Response to application (20A120) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, January 13, by 5 p.m. ET.
Jan 12 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, et al.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 13 2021Response to application from respondents Gavin Newsom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Reply of applicants Wendy Gish, et al. filed.
ReplyReplyProof of Service
Jan 25 2021Supplemental brief of applicants Wendy Gish, et al. filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2021Application (20A120) referred to the Court.
Feb 08 2021The application for injunctive relief, presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court, is treated as a petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment, and the petition is granted. The December 11, 2020 order of the United States District Court for the Central District of California is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit with instructions to remand to the District Court for further consideration in light of South Bay United Pentecostal Church v. Newsom, 592 U. S. ___ (2021).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ronald David Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
8 Hillside Avenue, Ste. 103
Montclair, NJ 07042

rcoleman@dhillonlaw.com
973-298-1723
Party name: Wendy Gish, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: Gavin Newsom, et al.
Other
Alexander J. Luchenitser
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

luchenitser@au.org
202-466-7306
Party name: Americans United for Separation of Church and State; ADL (Anti-Defamation League); Central Conference of American Rabbis; Covenant Network of Presbyterians; General Synod of the United Church of Christ; Interfaith Alliance Foundation; Methodist Federation for Social Action; National Council of the Churches of Christ in the USA; Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association; Union for Reform Judaism

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543