Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-1199
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-1199
Title:Students for Fair Admissions, Inc., Petitioner
v.
President and Fellows of Harvard College
Docketed:March 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2005)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 31, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 31, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021.
Mar 23 2021Brief amici curiae of Gail Heriot and Peter N. Kirsanow filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Professor David E. Bernstein filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Economists in Support of Petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of Speech First filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2021Brief amicus curiae of The State of Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, Reason Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, Individual Rights Foundation, Chinese American Citizens Alliance - Greater New York, Coalition for TJ, and Yi Fang Chen filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of The Louis D. Brandeis Center for Human Rights Under Law and the Silicon Valley Chinese Association Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Richard Sander in support of neither filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amici curiae of The Asian American Coalition For Education and The Asian American Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Californians for Equal Rights Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of Former Federal Officials of the Department of Education's Office for Civil Rights filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 31 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Students for Fair Admissions, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: President and Fellows of Harvard College
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Claremont Institute
1317 W. Foothill Blvd., Ste 120
Upland, CA 91786

tcaso@claremont.org
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
William E. Trachman
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Former Federal Officials of the Department of Education's Office for Civil Rights
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Speech First
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
H. Christopher Coates
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of H. Christopher Coates
934 Compass Point
Charleston, SC 29412

curriecoates@gmail.com
(843) 609-7080
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Wencong Fa
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, Reason Foundation, Center for Equal Opportunity, Individual Rights Foundation, Chinese American Citizens Alliance - Greater New York, Coalition for TJ, and Yi Fang Chen
Gordon M. Fauth Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Litigation Law Group
1935 Addison St., Ste. A
Berkeley, CA 94704

gmf@classlitigation.com
5102389610
Party name: The Asian American Coalition For Education and The Asian American Legal Foundation
Theodore Harold Frank
    Counsel of Record
Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
1629 K Street NW, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

tfrank@gmail.com
7032033848
Party name: Hamilton Lincoln Law Institute
C. Boyden Gray
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray and Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, NW
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

info@boydengrayassociates.com
202-955-0620
Party name: Economists in Support of Petitioner
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Peter Nicholas Kirsanow
    Counsel of Record
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP
200 Public Square, Suite 2300
Cleveland, OH 44114

pkirsanow@beneschlaw.com
2163634500
Party name: Gail Heriot and Peter N. Kirsanow
Cory Ren Liu
    Counsel of Record
Ashcroft Law Firm LLC
919 Congress Ave.
Ste. 1325
Austin, TX 78701

cliu@ashcroftlawfirm.com
512-370-1800
Party name: Professor David E. Bernstein
Daniel Isaac Morenoff
    Counsel of Record
The Equal Voting Rights Institute d/b/a The American Civil Rights Project
P.O. Box 12207
Dallas, TX 75225

dan@americancivilrightsproject.org
(214) 504-1835
Party name: The Californians for Equal Rights Foundation
Dennis J. Saffran
    Counsel of Record
Dennis Saffran, Attorney at Law
38-18 West Drive
Douglaston, NY 11363

djsaffranlaw@gmail.com
(718) 428-7156
Party name: National Association of Scholars
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
190 LaSalle Street
Suite 1500
Chicago, IL 60603

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
3122637668
Party name: The Liberty Justice Center
Stuart S. Taylor Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Self-employed
3911 Jocelyn St. NW
Washington, DC 20015

stuarttaylorjr@gmail.com
202-365-1812
Party name: Richard Sander
Jonathan Andrew Vogel
    Counsel of Record
Vogel Law Firm PLLC
6000 Fairview Road
South Park Towers, Suite 1200
Charlotte, NC 28210

jonathan.vogel@vogelpllc.com
704-552-3750
Party name: The Louis D. Brandeis Center for Human Rights Under Law and the Silicon Valley Chinese Association Foundation
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
119 South Monroe Street
Suite 300
Tallahassee, FL 32301

edw@hgslaw.com
850-425-2352
Party name: Former Attorney General Edwin Meese III

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543