Docket for 19-798
|
Oct 17 2019 | Application (19A436) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 25, 2019 to December 20, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main Document | Oct 21 2019 | Application (19A436) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 20, 2019. | | | Dec 19 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2020) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 30 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 31 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2020. | | | Feb 20 2020 | Brief of respondents Mississippi Transportation Commission, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 05 2020 | Reply of petitioner Bay Point Properties, Incorporated filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 11 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/27/2020. | | | Mar 30 2020 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|