Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 19-51
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 19-51
Title:Ben Branch, et al., Petitioners
v.
Massachusetts Department of Labor Relations, et al.
Docketed:July 8, 2019
Lower Ct:Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
   Case Numbers:(SJC-12603)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2019Waiver of right of respondents Department of Labor Relations, Commonwealth Employment Relations Board, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 06 2019Waiver of right of respondents Massachusetts Society of Professors/MTA/NEA; Hanover Teachers Association/MTA/NEA; Professional Staff Union/MTA/NEA to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pioneer Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 23 2019Response Requested. (Due September 23, 2019)
Sep 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 23, 2019 to November 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Nov 22 2019Brief of Union Respondents Massachusetts Society of Professors/MTA/NEA, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2019Brief of respondents Department of Labor Relations, Commonwealth Employment Relations Board, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2019Reply of petitioners Ben Branch, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
7573524522
Party name: Ben Branch, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey William Burritt
    Counsel of Record
National Education Association
1201 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

jburritt@nea.org
(202) 822-7231
Party name: Massachusetts Society of Professors/MTA/NEA; Hanover Teachers Association/MTA/NEA; Professional Staff Union/MTA/NEA
Timothy James Casey
    Counsel of Record
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

timothy.casey@mass.gov
(617) 963-2043
Party name: Department of Labor Relations, Commonwealth Employment Relations Board, et al.
Other
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Mark Gerard Matuschak
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.matuschak@wilmerhale.com
(617) 526-6000
Party name: Pioneer Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543